U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00018
  • Case Name: L&D Investments, Inc. v. Antero Resources Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Other Document]
  • April 24, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Remand]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 12, 2025: [First Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.