U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00057
  • Case Name: Wilburn v. United States
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Return Receipt]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 25, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.