U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00010
  • Case Name: Celaya-Padilla v. Starr
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • May 05, 2025: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 15, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.