U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00011
  • Case Name: Sanders v. Soward
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • May 09, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 06, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.