U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Jones v. Buckhannon-Upshur Circuit Court
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 07, 2025: [Return Receipt]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 12, 2025: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.