U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00006
  • Case Name: Freeman v. Upshur County Sheriff's Office et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2025: [Complaint (NOT for attorney use)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Return Receipt]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Prisoner Consent to Collection of Fees]
  • March 26, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • March 19, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 13, 2025: [Complaint (NOT for attorney use)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.