U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Edgefield Holdings, LLC, v. Builders Unlimited, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 22, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 11, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 02, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [First Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.