U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00020
  • Case Name: Potter v. FCI Hazelton Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Return Receipt]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.