U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00149
  • Case Name: Patterson v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 12, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • May 12, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 12, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 28, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 17, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Return Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.