U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00161
  • Case Name: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Burlington United Methodist Family Services, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 22, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2025: [First Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 01, 2025: [Counterclaim]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.