U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Pritchett v. Brown, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 25, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • March 18, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.