U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00233
  • Case Name: Swihart et al v. Diallo et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • April 29, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 28, 2025: [Other Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 26, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • March 24, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 20, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 20, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.