U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00230
  • Case Name: Cooper v. City of Wheeling et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [First Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • March 20, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.