U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Bell v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 29, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 20, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [First Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Verification of Attorney Admission]
  • March 18, 2025: [Other Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Removal (NOT for attorney use)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.