U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Hayes v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • May 08, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 14, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 04, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 04, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • March 19, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.