U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 28, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • April 28, 2025: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Paperless Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 19, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.