U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00164
  • Case Name: Warren v. Myers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 08, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 07, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability]
  • May 07, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability]
  • April 30, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 02, 2025: [Return Receipt]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order to Answer]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Case Reopened]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.