U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00273
  • Case Name: Byrd v. Brill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Other Document]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.