U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00063
  • Case Name: Dale v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Return Receipt]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 28, 2025: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • April 17, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 10, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 10, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 04, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 01, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 01, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Prisoner Consent to Collection of Fees]
  • March 20, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 20, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.