U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Strasburg v. Chief Riggleman, Moorefield Police
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Electronic Record Transmitted to 4th Circuit]
  • April 08, 2025: [USCA Records Request]
  • April 08, 2025: [USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening]
  • April 07, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 07, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis (APPEAL)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.