U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00021
  • Case Name: Smith v. Exomod Concepts, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 26, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 26, 2025: [First Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Verification of Attorney Admission]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Removal (NOT for attorney use)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.