U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Gibson v. W.VA. Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • May 05, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 02, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.