U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00022
  • Case Name: Tucker v. State of West Virginia Office of Lawyers Disciplinary Counsel et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 16, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 07, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 03, 2025: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 01, 2025: [Return Receipt]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 24, 2025: [Complaint (NOT for attorney use)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.