U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00023
  • Case Name: GARZA-LIMONES v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Return Receipt]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Other Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 24, 2025: [Prisoner Consent to Collection of Fees]
  • March 24, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 24, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.