U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Davis v. The Procter & Gamble Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [First Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • April 07, 2025: [Paperless Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.