U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00014
  • Case Name: Accelerant Specialty Insurance Company, v. Complete Property Services, L.L.C., et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Public Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 09, 2025: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Other Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [First Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.