U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Pleasant v. Starr et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Return Receipt]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Return Receipt]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.