U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • May 02, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 01, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [First Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appear]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 01, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appear]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Verification of Attorney Admission]
  • March 27, 2025: [Report Re: Patent/Trademark]
  • March 27, 2025: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Complaint (NOT for attorney use)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.