U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00012
  • Case Name: Breech et al v. Ergon Trucking, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion (SEALED)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order (SEALED)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Witness List]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order (SEALED)]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order (SEALED)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.