U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Sanders v. Fike
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 03, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 01, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Complaint (NOT for attorney use)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.