U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Williams v. Experian Information Solution Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • May 07, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Mail Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 24, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 07, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear]
  • April 04, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proposed Order (NOT PRETRIAL)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Removal (NOT for attorney use)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.