U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Waterfront Family Pharmacy LLC v. Optumrx, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Appear]
  • May 09, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 08, 2025: [Appear]
  • May 01, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 28, 2025: [First Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Verification of Attorney Admission]
  • April 25, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 24, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Verification of Attorney Admission]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Complaint (NOT for attorney use)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.