U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Lopez v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 01, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 01, 2025: [Court-Approved Form]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 09, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Prisoner Consent to Collection of Fees]
  • March 31, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • March 31, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 31, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.