U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00022
  • Case Name: Haymond et al v Antero Resources Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 08, 2025: [Appear]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.