U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Duncan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 24, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 24, 2025: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • April 24, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 24, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 22, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Petition]
  • March 31, 2025: [PS 42 Consent to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 31, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 31, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 31, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 31, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Paperless Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.