U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Folse v. Hoffman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.