U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00040
  • Case Name: Wilkerson v. Hudgins et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Return Receipt]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Reopening Case]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reopen Case]
  • April 22, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [Return Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.