U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00051
  • Case Name: Silver v. Transunion, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 30, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 07, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear]
  • April 01, 2025: [Complaint (NOT for attorney use)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.