U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00074
  • Case Name: Taylor v. Allen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • May 02, 2025: [Return Receipt]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 28, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 28, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 17, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 11, 2025: [Court-Approved Form]
  • April 09, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.