U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Young v. Starr
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 07, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2025: [Return Receipt]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 21, 2025: [Court-Approved Form]
  • April 17, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 14, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 14, 2025: [Court-Approved Form]
  • April 11, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.