U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00052
  • Case Name: Hanna v. Eastern Regional Jail
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Court-Approved Form]
  • April 14, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 04, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Prisoner Consent to Collection of Fees]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint (NOT for attorney use)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.