U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00032
  • Case Name: Hoff v. Sheriff Todd Forbes et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Public Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Public Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 25, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint (NOT for attorney use)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.