U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-bk-30176
  • Case Name: Matthew Scott Thompson and Desiree Marie Thompson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Hearing Set/Cnt/Rsch (Final)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Hearing Held]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Response]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Hearing Set/Cnt/Rsch (Preliminary)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Proposed Order]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Auto Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Lift/Modify/Terminate Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Lift/Modify/Terminate Automatic Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Notice to Clarify Filing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Appearance and Request for Service Under BR 9010]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.