U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-00200
  • Case Name: Chad Wayne Salesky and Megan Brooke Salesky
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Notice of Appearance and Request]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [BNC Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched - BK]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Amending Schedule]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Payment Advices - Statement Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Payment Advices]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Schedules A-J]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Summary of Schedules: Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Notice of Missing Documents]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [none]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [none]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Johnson, Ryan Winquist [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.