U.S. District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jimenez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Preliminary Examination]
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 18, 2025: [Paperless Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Detain]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.