U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00086
  • Case Name: Degasperin v. Searls
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • May 02, 2025: [Return Receipt]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 22, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.