U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-30108
  • Case Name: Bit-Tech LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Appearance and Request for Service Under BR 9010]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Notice of Missing Documents (Chapter 11)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Schedules/Statements]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Chapter 11 Operating Order]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Proposed Order]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Hearing Set/Cnt/Rsch (Document)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Hearing Set/Cnt/Rsch (Sub V Status Conference)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Corrected Image of Document]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Notice of Motion/Application to Employ Professional]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Proposed Order]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Employ]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Transmission of Document to BNC or Counsel for Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Change of Address]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Corrected Image of Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Change of Address]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Transmission of Document to BNC or Counsel for Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Hearing Set/Cnt/Rsch (Sub V Status Conference)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Appointment of Trustee (Notice)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Notice (Generic)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice (Generic)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Supple, Joe [Uploaded Creditors]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Uploaded Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appearance and Request for Service Under BR 9010]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.