U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00089
  • Case Name: Nelson v. Berkeley County Prosecuting Attorney's Office et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • May 07, 2025: [Electronic Record Transmitted to 4th Circuit]
  • May 07, 2025: [USCA Records Request]
  • May 07, 2025: [USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening]
  • May 06, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 29, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Prisoner Consent to Collection of Fees]
  • April 21, 2025: [Complaint (NOT for attorney use)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.