U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Boord v. Newlon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Appear]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 24, 2025: [First Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Verification of Attorney Admission]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Removal (NOT for attorney use)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.