U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-28521-svk
  • Case Name: Michelle Lee Legate
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Approving Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report & Account, Professional Fees Recorded, Closing Case]
February, 2019
  • February 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Return Mail]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account(batch)]
  • January 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Dismiss Case]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Proposed Order]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Affidavit/Certification of No Objection/Response/Answer]
December, 2018
  • December 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Dismiss Case]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Claim Objection Action]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Proposed Order]
December, 2017
  • December 10, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Trustee's Recommendation for Confirmation]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 18, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Proposed Order]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Affidavit/Certification of No Objection/Response/Answer]
  • November 05, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Return Mail]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Meeting of Creditors Held]
September, 2017
  • September 23, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [To Continue Stay]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Proposed Order]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Affidavit/Certification of No Objection/Response/Answer]
  • September 01, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Order to Pay Wages]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Affidavit]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Continue Stay]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Ch 13 Form 122C-1)]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 13)]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.